03/02/2064 |
Joined the Vancouver Baycats. |
05/02/2064 |
Goes 5-7 against the Winnipeg HS Invaders, with 1 2B, 3 RBI and 4 R. |
06/10/2064 |
Wins the 2064 Pony League 14U World Series with the Vancouver Baycats! |
01/01/2065 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (40); Power: 40 (50); Eye: 50 (65). |
06/10/2065 |
Wins the 2065 Pony League 14U World Series with the Vancouver Baycats! |
01/01/2066 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (40); Power: 40 (50); Eye: 50 (65). |
07/12/2066 |
Released by the Vancouver Baycats. |
07/12/2066 |
Retired from baseball. |
07/12/2066 |
Drafted in the 2066 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 10, 70th overall pick) by the Toronto Mythics. |
07/12/2066 |
Released by the Toronto organization. |
07/12/2066 |
Retired from baseball. |
07/12/2066 |
Drafted in the 2066 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 10, 70th overall pick) by the Toronto Mythics. |
07/12/2066 |
Released by the Toronto organization. |
07/12/2066 |
Retired from baseball. |
07/12/2066 |
Drafted in the 2066 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 10, 70th overall pick) by the Toronto Mythics. |
01/01/2067 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (70). |
06/27/2067 |
Was traded by the Toronto Mythics to the Carolina Reapers, along with 1B Takuhiro Uchida, SP Juan Vega, LF Jerry Martinez, and SP Keith Givens, in exchange for CF Bungo Oshima. |
01/01/2068 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (40); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (70). |
09/01/2068 |
Wins the 2068 Championship with the Biloxi Rollers! |
01/01/2069 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (70). |
12/06/2069 |
Was traded by the Carolina Reapers to the Philadelphia Liberty, along with 2B Zachary Lang and 3B Francisco Galindo, in exchange for SP Jake Vecsey. |
01/01/2070 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (65). |
01/01/2071 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (60). |
01/01/2072 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 45 (60). |
01/01/2073 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (45); Power: 40 (45); Eye: 50 (60). |
11/10/2073 |
Was traded by the Philadelphia Liberty to the Indianapolis Hawks, along with 2B Brendan Sherlock, in exchange for CF Jens van Ommeren and RF Jason Forsythe. |
01/01/2074 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
01/01/2075 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
01/01/2076 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
01/01/2077 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
05/23/2077 |
Injured (hamstring soreness),day-to-day for 2 days. |
08/23/2077 |
Injured (hamstring tendinitis),out for one week. |
01/01/2078 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
10/24/2078 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $500,000. |
01/01/2079 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (55). |
10/24/2079 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $500,000. |
01/01/2080 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
10/20/2080 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $500,000. |
01/01/2081 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
10/27/2081 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $500,000. |