10/01/2030 |
Drafted in the 2030 first-year player draft out of college (Minnesota; Minneapolis, MN) by the University of Illinois Fighting Illini (Round 3, Pick 21, 97th overall pick). |
10/31/2030 |
Failed to sign with the University of Illinois Fighting Illini organization and returned to college. |
01/01/2031 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (40); Power: 25 (35); Eye: 25 (35). |
10/01/2031 |
Drafted in the 2031 first-year player draft out of college (Minnesota; Minneapolis, MN) by the University of Conneticut Huskies (Round 9, Pick 14, 319th overall pick). |
11/14/2031 |
Named the #85 prospect in the NCAA |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (40); Power: 25 (40); Eye: 30 (35). |
05/02/2032 |
Released by the University of Conneticut Huskies. |
05/02/2032 |
Drafted in the 2032 first-year player draft (Round 9, Pick 12, 252nd overall pick) by the New York Mets, out of college (Minnesota). |
12/15/2032 |
Released by the New York organization. |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 30 (35); Eye: 30 (40). |
03/19/2033 |
Signed a minor league contract with the New York Mets organization. |
03/24/2033 |
Released by the New York organization. |
04/02/2033 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Cleveland Indians organization. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 30 (40); Eye: 30 (35). |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 30 (35); Eye: 35 (35). |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 40 (40); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 35 (35). |
01/01/2037 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 40 (40); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 30 (35). |
11/01/2037 |
Wins the 2037 CAL AL Glove Wizard Award at RF. |
01/01/2038 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 35 (35). |
11/25/2038 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2039 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (40); Power: 30 (35); Eye: 35 (35). |
01/25/2039 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Texas Rangers organization. |
02/07/2039 |
Released by the Texas organization. |
10/28/2039 |
Retired from professional baseball. |