07/01/1958 |
Drafted in the 1957 first-year player draft (Round 3, Pick 2, 22nd overall pick) by the Manly-Warringah Sea Eagles. |
11/09/1958 |
Injured (hamstring strain), out for 5 weeks. |
01/01/1959 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 1 (3); Eye: 1 (3). |
01/01/1960 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 1 (2); Eye: 2 (3). |
07/14/1960 |
Was traded by the Manly-Warringah Sea Eagles to the Penrith Panthers, along with SS Lev Cusack, RF Col Svenson, in exchange for CL Willie Comer. |
01/01/1961 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (5); Power: 1 (3); Eye: 2 (4). |
02/16/1961 |
Goes 5-5 against the Hurstville Sluggers, with 2 RBI and 2 R. |
01/01/1962 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 1 (2); Eye: 2 (2). |
02/28/1962 |
Injured (groin soreness), day-to-day for 1 day. |
01/01/1963 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 2 (2). |
01/01/1964 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 2 (2). |
02/27/1964 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract extension with the Penrith Panthers organization. |
03/03/1964 |
Wins the 1963 Championship with the Blacktown Pumas! |
08/11/1964 |
Released by the Penrith organization. |
01/01/1965 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 2 (2). |
01/01/1965 |
Retired from professional baseball. |