06/02/1977 |
Drafted in the 1977 first-year player draft by the Cincinnati Reds (Round 34, Pick 14, 872nd overall pick). |
06/27/1977 |
Released by the Cincinnati organization. |
01/01/1978 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 39 (50); Movement: 19 (19); Control: 1 (1). |
04/19/1978 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Kansas City Royals organization. |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 54 (63); Movement: 24 (24); Control: 1 (1). |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 54 (62); Movement: 28 (28); Control: 1 (1). |
01/01/1981 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 53 (53); Movement: 35 (35); Control: 6 (6). |
01/01/1982 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 53 (53); Movement: 38 (38); Control: 6 (6). |
01/01/1983 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 56 (56); Movement: 37 (37); Control: 8 (19). |
11/15/1983 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1984 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 57 (57); Movement: 36 (36); Control: 10 (20). |
10/23/1984 |
Retired from professional baseball. |