10/27/2048 |
Signed a minor league contract out of Iraq with the Charlotte Cougars organization. |
01/01/2049 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (5); Power: 2 (9); Eye: 1 (6). |
01/01/2050 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 1 (5); Power: 2 (9); Eye: 1 (6). |
06/30/2050 |
Injured (bruised thigh),day-to-day for 5 days. |
01/01/2051 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 2 (5); Power: 3 (9); Eye: 2 (6). |
11/09/2051 |
Was traded by the Charlotte Cougars to the Twin Cities River Monsters, along with SP Haravira Chandar and SP Curt Fields, in exchange for SP Jamie Barber, SP Mark Moore, and CL Sebastian Seabert. |
01/01/2052 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 2 (5); Power: 3 (9); Eye: 2 (6). |
01/01/2053 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 4 (8); Eye: 3 (3). |
01/01/2054 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 6 (8); Eye: 3 (3). |
01/01/2055 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 7 (8); Eye: 3 (3). |
05/19/2055 |
Released by the Twin Cities organization. |
11/05/2055 |
Retired from professional baseball. |