06/05/2014 |
Drafted by the Houston Astros in the 4th round of the 2014 MLB June Amateur Draft from Texas A&M University (College Station, TX). |
07/23/2015 |
Traded by the Houston Astros to the Oakland Athletics with C Jacob Nottingham for P Scott Kazmir. |
03/30/2019 |
Was claimed off waivers by Detroit while with Oakland. |
05/04/2019 |
Injured (Tired arm), day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
08/07/2019 |
Injured (Finger blister), day-to-day for 1 day. |
11/21/2019 |
Was not offered arbitration and became a free agent. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 50 (50); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 60 (60). |
01/01/2020 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Colorado Rockies organization. |
04/25/2020 |
Was granted free agency by the Colorado organization. |
05/01/2020 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Binghamton Rumble Ponies organization. |
05/28/2020 |
Was claimed off waivers by Boston while with New York. |
11/18/2020 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 50 (50); Movement: 45 (45); Control: 60 (60). |
10/25/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |