06/03/2003 |
Drafted by the Florida Marlins in the 23rd round of the 2003 MLB June Amateur Draft from Dallas Center Grimes HS (Grimes, IA). Did not sign. |
06/06/2006 |
Drafted by the Baltimore Orioles in the 17th round of the 2006 MLB June Amateur Draft from University of Nebraska at Lincoln (Lincoln, NE). Did not sign. |
06/07/2007 |
Drafted by the Pittsburgh Pirates in the 9th round of the 2007 MLB June Amateur Draft from University of Nebraska at Lincoln (Lincoln, NE). |
07/15/2014 |
Selected to the 2014 MLB All-Star Game. |
07/31/2017 |
Was traded by the Pittsburgh Pirates to the Los Angeles Dodgers in exchange for 3B Oneil Cruz and P Angel German. |
11/02/2017 |
Became a free agent. |
02/19/2018 |
Signed a 3-year contract worth a total of $9,000,000 with the San Francisco Giants organization. |
07/16/2019 |
Injured (Sprained elbow), day-to-day for one week. |
07/22/2019 |
Was traded by the San Francisco Giants to the Milwaukee Brewers in exchange for RF Micah Bello, RP Kleiber Bordones. |
11/01/2019 |
Declined his contract option. |
11/06/2019 |
Signed a 2-year contract extension worth a total of $9,220,000 with the Milwaukee Brewers organization. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 60 (60); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 70 (70). |
11/20/2020 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 55 (60); Movement: 50 (50); Control: 65 (70). |
02/15/2021 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Chicago Cubs organization. |
05/28/2021 |
Injured (Earache), day-to-day for 3 days. |
07/23/2021 |
Released by the Chicago Cubs. |
10/25/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |