06/05/2008 |
Drafted by the Boston Red Sox in the 27th round of the 2008 MLB June Amateur Draft from Ross S. Sterling HS (Baytown, TX). |
05/15/2012 |
Sent to the Chicago Cubs as the PTBNL from a previous trade (OF Marlon Byrd to BOS - 04/21/2012). |
05/29/2015 |
Released by the Chicago Cubs. |
06/12/2015 |
Signed a contract with the Sugar Land Skeeters. |
07/07/2015 |
Signed as a free agent with the Atlanta Braves. |
08/06/2016 |
Traded by the Atlanta Braves to the Miami Marlins for P Michael Mader and IF Anfernee Seymour. |
03/08/2018 |
Released by the Miami Marlins organization. |
03/13/2018 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Baltimore Orioles organization. |
03/29/2018 |
Released by the Baltimore Orioles organization. |
06/05/2018 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Detroit Tigers organization. |
11/02/2018 |
Became a free agent. |
11/19/2018 |
Signed a minor league contract with the St. Louis Cardinals organization. |
11/23/2019 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 60 (65); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 45 (45). |
05/31/2020 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Seattle Mariners organization. |
07/05/2020 |
Injured (Rotator cuff strain), out for 3 weeks. |
10/29/2020 |
Released by the Seattle organization. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 60 (60); Movement: 55 (55); Control: 45 (45). |
10/25/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |