06/02/1999 |
Drafted by the St. Louis Cardinals in the 7th round of the 1999 MLB June Amateur Draft from Los Angeles Pierce College (Woodland Hills, CA). |
08/07/2002 |
Traded by the St. Louis Cardinals to the Cleveland Indians as the PTBNL in a previous trade (P Chuck Finley to St. Louis - 07/19/2002) |
01/27/2006 |
Traded by the Cleveland Indians to the Boston Red Sox along with P David Riske and C Josh Bard in exchange for P Guillermo Mota, 3B Andy Marte, C Kelly Shoppach, and a PTBNL (P Randy Newsom - 07/21/2006) |
10/28/2007 |
Won the 2007 Major League World Series with the Boston Red Sox |
11/19/2008 |
Traded by the Boston Red Sox to the Kansas City Royals in exchange for P Ramon S. Ramirez |
12/23/2009 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Oakland Athletics |
01/05/2012 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Oakland Athletics |
01/01/2017 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
05/15/2017 |
Signed a 1-year contract extension worth a total of $1,470,300 with the Oakland Athletics organization. |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (50); Power: 45 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
08/11/2018 |
Injured (forearm tendinitis), out for one week. |
11/22/2018 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (50); Power: 45 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/2019 |
Retired from professional baseball. |