06/05/2001 |
Drafted in the 2001 first-year player draft (Round 34, 1024th overall pick) by the Colorado Rockies |
06/07/2004 |
Drafted by the Cleveland Indians in the 19th round of the 2004 MLB June Amateur Draft from University of Nevada-Reno (Reno, NV). |
12/14/2010 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Seattle Mariners. |
12/14/2011 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Seattle Mariners. |
02/16/2012 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Tampa Bay Rays. |
12/20/2013 |
Selected off waivers by the Oakland Athletics from the Tampa Bay Rays. |
03/28/2014 |
Selected off waivers by the Texas Rangers from the Oakland Athletics. |
04/09/2014 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Texas Rangers. |
08/23/2014 |
Was traded by the Texas Rangers to the Cleveland Indians for future considerations. |
11/20/2014 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Texas Rangers. |
11/20/2016 |
Was not offered arbitration and became a free agent. |
01/01/2017 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (50); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
01/01/2019 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
01/01/2019 |
Retired from professional baseball. |