06/05/2001 |
Drafted by the Anaheim Angels in the 29th round of the 2001 MLB June Amateur Draft from Francisco Oller (Catano, PR). Did not sign. |
06/03/2003 |
Drafted by the Milwaukee Brewers in the 12th round of the 2003 MLB June Amateur Draft from Florida Gateway College (Lake City, FL). |
11/27/2009 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
11/11/2010 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Houston Astros. |
11/29/2011 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Houston Astros. |
01/21/2015 |
Traded by the Houston Astros to the Texas Rangers for P Akeem Bostick. |
01/26/2016 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the New York Yankees. |
04/02/2016 |
Traded by the New York Yankees to the Tampa Bay Rays for cash. |
08/12/2016 |
Released by the Tampa Bay organization. |
01/01/2017 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 40 (40). |
01/01/2018 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 40 (40). |
01/01/2018 |
Retired from professional baseball. |