10/01/2031 |
Drafted in the 2031 first-year player draft out of high school (Smith Jewish Day School; Rockville, MD) by the University of South Carolina Gamecocks (Round 13, Pick 22, 471st overall pick). |
01/01/2032 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (35); Power: 20 (30); Eye: 30 (45). |
03/31/2032 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $15,000 through automatic renewal. |
05/02/2032 |
Remained undrafted and became a free agent. |
06/11/2032 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $22,800 with the Oklahoma State University Cowboys organization. |
01/01/2033 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (35); Power: 20 (30); Eye: 35 (45). |
05/02/2033 |
Remained undrafted and became a free agent. |
06/28/2033 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $19,400 with the University of Conneticut Huskies organization. |
10/02/2033 |
Released by the University of Conneticut Huskies. |
10/07/2033 |
Signed a minor league contract with the University of Nebraska Cornhuskers organization. |
01/01/2034 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (35); Power: 20 (30); Eye: 40 (45). |
02/13/2034 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $20,000 through automatic renewal. |
05/02/2034 |
Remained undrafted and became a free agent. |
07/09/2034 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $67,000 with the Clemson University Tigers organization. |
01/01/2035 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 20 (30); Eye: 40 (45). |
01/25/2035 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $67,000 through automatic renewal. |
04/29/2035 |
Remained undrafted and became a free agent. |
05/31/2035 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $84,000 with the Arizona State University Sun Devils organization. |
01/01/2036 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (35); Power: 20 (30); Eye: 45 (45). |
03/13/2036 |
Was not offered arbitration and became a free agent. |
09/14/2036 |
Retired from professional baseball. |