09/05/2078 |
Wins the RLB RL Player of the Week Award. |
09/21/2078 |
Injured (Back stiffness), day-to-day for 5 days. |
11/29/2078 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2079 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 55 (55); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
03/17/2079 |
Signed a 2-year contract worth a total of $12,000,000 with the Jackson River Monsters organization. |
04/26/2079 |
Injured (Foot contusion), out for 2 weeks. |
01/01/2080 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
11/30/2080 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2081 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
05/04/2081 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $6,500,000 with the Buffalo Stampede organization. |
05/28/2081 |
Injured (back stiffness),day-to-day for 1 day. |
09/01/2081 |
Released by the Buffalo Stampede. |
01/01/2082 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
01/01/2083 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
02/03/2083 |
Signed a 3-year contract worth a total of $7,200,000 with the Houston Red Bulls organization. |
06/29/2083 |
Injured (sore hamstring),day-to-day for one week. |
08/31/2083 |
Injured (bruised thigh),day-to-day for 3 days. |
11/05/2083 |
Houston Red Bulls have executed the contract year option. |
12/12/2083 |
Was traded by the Houston Red Bulls to the Los Angeles Brazzers of Burbank, along with CF Alfons Sampsted, in exchange for a 2nd round draft pick. |
01/01/2084 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 60 (60). |
01/01/2085 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 60 (60). |
04/06/2085 |
Injured (severe hip strain),out for 6-7 weeks. |
08/05/2085 |
Injured (calf cramp),day-to-day for 1 day. |
11/22/2085 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2086 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 60 (60). |
11/07/2086 |
Retired from professional baseball. |