06/07/2005 |
Drafted by the Cleveland Indians in the 21st round of the 2005 MLB June Amateur Draft from North Dakota State University (Fargo, ND). |
05/11/2010 |
Traded by the Cleveland Indians to the Oakland Athletics for cash. |
05/28/2012 |
Claimed off waivers by the San Diego Padres from the Oakland Athletics. |
11/03/2012 |
Became a free agent. |
11/15/2012 |
Signed as a free agent with the Toronto Blue Jays. |
09/02/2014 |
Released by the Toronto Blue Jays. |
09/12/2014 |
Signed as a free agent with the Tampa Bay Rays. |
08/02/2017 |
Released by the Tampa Bay Rays organization. |
08/15/2017 |
Signed a minor league contract with the New York Mets organization. |
11/06/2017 |
Became a free agent. |
12/12/2017 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $800,000 with the Saitama Seibu Lions organization. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 55 (55); Movement: 60 (65); Control: 45 (45). |
11/08/2020 |
Retired from professional baseball. |