06/07/2004 |
Drafted by the Colorado Rockies in the 37th round of the 2004 MLB June Amateur Draft from Toms River South HS (Toms River, NJ). Did not sign. |
06/07/2007 |
Drafted by the Cincinnati Reds in the 1st round (34th) of the 2007 MLB June Amateur Draft from Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey (New Brunswick, NJ). |
07/15/2014 |
Selected to the 2014 MLB All-Star Game. |
07/14/2015 |
Selected to the 2015 MLB All-Star Game. |
12/16/2015 |
Traded by the Cincinnati Reds to the Chicago White Sox as part of a 3-team trade: The Chicago White Sox received IF Todd Frazier (CIN). The Cincinnati Reds received IF Brandon Dixon (LAD), IF Jose Peraza (LAD), and OF Scott Schebler (LAD). The Los Angeles Dodgers received OF Trayce Thompson (CWS), IF Micah Johnson (CWS), and P Frankie Montas (CWS). |
07/19/2017 |
Traded by the Chicago White Sox to the New York Yankees with P David Robertson and P Tommy Kahnle for P Tyler Clippard, P Ian Clarkin, OF Blake Rutherford, and OF Tito Polo. |
11/02/2017 |
Became a free agent. |
02/07/2018 |
Signed a 2-year contract worth a total of $17,000,000 with the New York Mets organization. |
05/17/2019 |
Injured (Broken nose), out for 5 days. |
11/29/2019 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 60 (60); Eye: 55 (60). |
11/08/2020 |
Retired from professional baseball. |