06/07/2005 |
Drafted by the New York Mets in the 13th round of the 2005 MLB June Amateur Draft from Mater Dei HS (Breese, IL). |
12/17/2012 |
Traded by the New York Mets with R.A. Dickey and Mike Nickeas to the Toronto Blue Jays for Wuilmer Becerra (minors), John Buck, Travis d'Arnaud and Noah Syndergaard. |
12/02/2015 |
Granted Free Agency. |
12/04/2015 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Toronto Blue Jays. |
08/30/2016 |
Granted Free Agency. |
08/31/2016 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Toronto Blue Jays. |
11/18/2016 |
Granted Free Agency. |
01/23/2017 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
03/28/2017 |
Released by the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
03/29/2017 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
03/18/2018 |
Released by the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
06/22/2018 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Detroit Tigers. |
11/02/2018 |
Granted Free Agency. |
01/16/2019 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Los Angeles Dodgers. |
06/09/2019 |
Injured (Bruised finger), day-to-day for 5 days. |
11/10/2019 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract extension with the Los Angeles Dodgers organization. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 40 (40); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 50 (55). |
06/05/2020 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract extension with the Los Angeles Dodgers organization. |
08/10/2020 |
Injured (Shoulder tendinitis), day-to-day for 1-2 weeks. |
09/20/2020 |
Retired from professional baseball. |