06/08/2010 |
Drafted by the Toronto Blue Jays in the 1st round (41st) of the 2010 MLB June Amateur Draft from The Citadel (Charleston, SC). |
07/20/2012 |
Traded by the Toronto Blue Jays to the Houston Astros with OF Ben Francisco, C Carlos Perez, P David Rollins, P Joe Musgrove, P Francisco Cordero, and a PTBNL (P Kevin Comer - 08/16/12) for P David Carpenter, P J.A. Happ, and P Brandon Lyon. |
05/24/2016 |
Claimed off waivers by the Miami Marlins from the Houston Astros. |
11/07/2016 |
Became a free agent. |
12/12/2016 |
Signed as a free agent with the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
03/28/2017 |
Released by the Arizona Diamondbacks. |
04/20/2017 |
Signed as a free agent with the Cincinnati Reds. |
10/09/2017 |
Became a free agent. |
12/01/2017 |
Signed as a free agent with the Baltimore Orioles. |
07/18/2018 |
Released by the Baltimore Orioles organization. |
07/25/2018 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Chicago White Sox organization. |
11/02/2018 |
Became a free agent. |
02/14/2019 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the Cleveland Indians. |
07/08/2019 |
Was selected to the 2019 Eastern League All-Star Game. |
07/21/2019 |
Injured (Elbow inflammation), out for one week. |
11/29/2019 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/2020 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 55 (55); Movement: 30 (30); Control: 50 (50). |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 55 (55); Movement: 35 (35); Control: 50 (50). |
11/05/2021 |
Retired from professional baseball. |