01/01/2042 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (7); Power: 3 (7); Eye: 3 (6). |
01/01/2043 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (7); Power: 3 (7); Eye: 4 (6). |
06/01/2043 |
Drafted in the 2043 first-year player draft out of college (Lubbock Christian; Lubbock, TX) by the New York Mets. (Round 1, Pick 22, 22nd overall pick). |
01/01/2044 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (7); Power: 3 (7); Eye: 4 (7). |
06/20/2044 |
Suspended 5 games after ejection following a brawl. |
07/19/2044 |
Was traded by the New York Mets to the Baltimore Orioles in exchange for RP Alejandro Hernández and RF Chance Larson. |
01/01/2045 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (6); Power: 3 (7); Eye: 4 (7). |
07/21/2045 |
Was traded by the Baltimore Orioles to the New York Mets, along with RP Athan Karaiskakis, in exchange for 1B Manuel Salazar and RF Andrew Briggs. |
01/01/2046 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (6); Power: 3 (6); Eye: 5 (7). |
03/23/2046 |
Was traded by the New York Mets to the Minnesota Twins, along with LF San-gui Pai and $60,000, in exchange for RP Wan-hua Zhong. |
11/14/2046 |
Released by the Minnesota organization. |
11/14/2046 |
Retired from professional baseball. |