03/01/1978 |
Drafted in the 1977 first-year player draft by the Detroit Griffins (Round 4, Pick 14, 56th overall pick). |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
01/01/1981 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
09/04/1981 |
Wins the 1981 International League Governor's Cup Finals with the Toronto Marlies! |
01/01/1982 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
01/01/1983 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
01/01/1984 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
01/01/1985 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
11/20/1985 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1986 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
11/21/1986 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1987 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 3 (3). |
11/16/1987 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1988 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
11/19/1988 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1989 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
11/20/1989 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1990 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
11/17/1990 |
Received a 1-year contract through automatic renewal worth a total of $350,000. |
01/01/1991 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 4 (4). |
08/01/1991 |
Was traded by the Detroit Griffins to the Denver 14ers, along with a 2nd round draft pick and $6,500,000, in exchange for CL Todd Burns, SP Sergio Valdez, and a 4th round draft pick. |
08/30/1991 |
Wins the 1991 International League Governors Cup with the Phoenix Firebirds! |
08/31/1991 |
Retired from professional baseball. |