06/17/1985 |
Drafted in the 1985 first-year player draft (Round 17, Pick 17, 433rd overall pick) by the Chicago Cubs. |
06/24/1985 |
Released by the Chicago organization. |
01/01/1986 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 26 (27); Power: 16 (18); Eye: 64 (64). |
02/23/1986 |
Signed a minor league contract with the California Angels organization. |
01/01/1987 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 27 (27); Power: 17 (17); Eye: 57 (60). |
01/01/1988 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 12 (14); Power: 17 (20); Eye: 54 (75). |
01/01/1989 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 13 (15); Power: 17 (20); Eye: 54 (73). |
01/01/1990 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 16 (17); Power: 17 (20); Eye: 53 (70). |
01/01/1991 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 15 (16); Power: 17 (18); Eye: 53 (66). |
05/06/1991 |
Released by the California organization. |
11/06/1991 |
Retired from professional baseball. |