09/03/1978 |
Signed a minor league contract out of Dominican Republic with the Oakland Athletics organization. |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 20 (40); Power: 15 (33); Eye: 1 (61). |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 24 (34); Power: 14 (14); Eye: 1 (48). |
01/01/1981 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 29 (34); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 28 (36). |
01/01/1982 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (34); Power: 1 (2); Eye: 37 (37). |
03/01/1982 |
Promoted from international complex to B & C Dunedin. |
01/01/1983 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (34); Power: 1 (3); Eye: 38 (38). |
01/01/1984 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 35 (35). |
01/01/1985 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 1 (1); Eye: 29 (29). |
11/13/1985 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1986 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (33); Power: 1 (2); Eye: 29 (29). |
11/05/1986 |
Retired from professional baseball. |