06/02/1978 |
Drafted in the 1978 first-year player draft (Round 19, Pick 13, 481st overall pick) by the Oakland Athletics. |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 21 (24); Power: 15 (39); Eye: 27 (34). |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 19 (24); Power: 7 (15); Eye: 27 (29). |
01/01/1981 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (10); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 32 (32). |
01/01/1982 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (11); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 33 (33). |
01/01/1983 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (12); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 33 (33). |
01/01/1984 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 12 (12); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 35 (35). |
11/13/1984 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1985 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (11); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 33 (33). |
11/01/1985 |
Retired from professional baseball. |