10/10/1975 |
Signed a minor league contract out of Dominican Republic with the San Diego Padres organization. |
01/01/1976 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 32 (70); Power: 20 (48); Eye: 23 (54). |
01/01/1977 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (68); Power: 20 (38); Eye: 21 (42). |
01/01/1978 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (48); Power: 19 (43); Eye: 19 (40). |
01/01/1979 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 14 (54); Power: 19 (36); Eye: 20 (36). |
04/30/1979 |
Released by the San Diego Padres. |
07/11/1979 |
Signed a minor league contract with the New York Yankees organization. |
01/01/1980 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 31 (46); Power: 17 (29); Eye: 22 (36). |
01/01/1981 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 28 (38); Power: 8 (20); Eye: 19 (39). |
01/01/1982 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (38); Power: 11 (20); Eye: 27 (40). |
11/13/1982 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
12/28/1982 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Toronto Blue Jays organization. |
01/01/1983 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 34 (37); Power: 11 (16); Eye: 27 (41). |
02/14/1983 |
Released by the Toronto organization. |
01/01/1984 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 33 (35); Power: 12 (13); Eye: 28 (41). |
10/23/1984 |
Retired from professional baseball. |